HI HB2257 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 090, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 090, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts the salary cap of the Superintendent of Education. Requires an annual evaluation of the Superintendent of Education based on outcomes determined by the Board of Education. Repeals June 30, 2024. (HB2257 CD1)
Title
Board of Education; Superintendent's Salary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act 090, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191). |
2014-06-18 | House | Act 090, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 753). |
2014-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 723). |
2014-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-14. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 152-14). |
2014-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-01-14. |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 152-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ige, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-28-14 4:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nakashima, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Fale Member. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 622) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3206) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2893) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-12-14 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 322). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Rhoads, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Hanohano, Thielen voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Ward. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 11:00AM. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4). |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Ing, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-07-14 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 119-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Awana, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, Takai. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2806 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.