HI HB2257 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the money transmitters act to expressly apply to persons engaged in the transmission of virtual currency. Requires licensees dealing with virtual currency to provide a warning to customers prior to entering into an agreement with the customers. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Virtual Currency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 682). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Choy, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 691) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3559) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 9:35AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 87). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-09-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2). |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Fukumoto, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 01-31-18 11:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3082 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).