HI HB2261 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Human Services to adopt rules to implement a standardized set of procedures accommodating
Title
Infant and Toddler Child Care; Complaints; Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-28 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-28-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2261&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2261_.HTM |