HI HB2267 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of $100,000,000 in special purpose revenue bonds to assist Clearcom, Inc., or a partnership headed by Clearcom, Inc., with planning, permitting, designing, constructing, equipping, and operating broadband infrastructure throughout the State. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Clearcom, Inc.; Hawaii Broadband Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2922) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-19-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-12 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 165). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 895-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-29-12 4:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-01-26 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 01-26-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |