HI HB2267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a mortgage loan originator company to be open during specified regular business hours to the public and for examination or investigation by the commissioner. Deletes exemptions for individuals facilitating mortgage loans for their family members and family property. Clarifies that a branch manager may not oversee more than one branch office or principal place of business. Excludes certain information included in NMLS from confidentiality provisions of the law. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB2267 HD1)
Title
Mortgage Loan Origination; Housekeeping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 325). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, C. Lee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-14. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2817 (Same As) 2014-07-03 - Act 198, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).