HI HB2267 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to TRE/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to TRE/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the State Highway Enforcement Program and related fund within the Department of Transportation. Establishes a parking violation surcharge to be imposed by courts in addition to other penalties and fines for parking violations on state highways. (HB2267 HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Highway Enforcement Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TRE/JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 594-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-02-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |