HI HB2272 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 062, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 062, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that sixty-seven per cent of unit owners may amend a condominium declaration at any time by vote or written consent, unless the declaration specifies a higher percentage. Requires developers to include annual reserve contributions based on a reserve study. Clarifies time and date requirements for petitions to amend bylaws and call for special meetings; electronic, machine, and mail voting; time frame for approval of minutes; and board meeting participation. Expands when electronic, machine, and mail voting is authorized. Requires a condominium association's reserve study to be reviewed by an independent reserve study preparer and reviewed or updated at least every three years. Specifies that cash flow plans be based on thirty-year projections. Effective 1/1/2023. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Condominium Associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 062, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 062, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 8-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 8-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-22 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson Chair; Kitagawa, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2022-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Misalucha). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-01-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3558) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 4). |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-03-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Cash Flow Plans
Condominium Associations
Declaration
Meetings
Notice
Petitions
Reserve Study
Unit Owners
Voting
Condominium Associations
Declaration
Meetings
Notice
Petitions
Reserve Study
Unit Owners
Voting