HI HB2273 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies which veterans qualify for civil service hiring preference. Effective July 1, 2112. (H2273 HD1)
Title
Civil Service; Veteran's Preference
Sponsors
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Kymberly Pine [R] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from EBM/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 365-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Pine. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM/LAB on Thursday, 02-11-10 11:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to EBM/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |