HI HB2273 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain violations of the Fireworks Control Law shall be considered a violation of noise control rules under the Hawaii noise pollution laws, punishable by civil penalties and subject to citations under those respective laws. Appropriates funds to establish one full-time equivalent position for an inspector in the department of health. Appropriates funds for the department of health to enter into a contract with a security company to assist the inspector. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 80). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 716-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-04-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Citations
Civil Penalties
Fireworks
Fireworks Control Law
Inspector
Noise Pollution
Violations
Citations
Civil Penalties
Fireworks
Fireworks Control Law
Inspector
Noise Pollution
Violations