HI HB2276 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires bills that amend or create new offenses, or change parole or probation procedures, to be accompanied by a correctional impact statement. Requires assistance of the corrections population management commission to prepare corrections impact statement. Effective January 1, 2112. (HB2276 HD1)
Title
Corrections; Correctional Impact Statement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 385-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tokioka, B. Oshiro, Evans, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Chong. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-10 2:00 PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-10-10 2:00 PM in house conference room 423. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Friday, 02-05-10 2:10 PM in House conference room 423. | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 68-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Rhoads; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Souki, Pine. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 01-28-10 9:45am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to PBS, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |