HI HB2299 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Enterprise Zone incentives for qualified renewable energy technology business activity on real property owned by the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority. Effective February 19, 2022. (HB2299 HD1)
Title
Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority; Enterprise Zone Incentives; Renewable Energy Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 398-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-09-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2828 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.