HI HB2301 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to TIA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to TIA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a pilot project to transfer jurisdiction of the maintenance of state highways in Maui county from the state Department of Transportation to the Maui County Department of Public Works. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB2301 HD2)
Title
State Highways Maintenance; Transfer to Maui
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 190). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Fourty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 648-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 272-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-08-10 9:00am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |