HI HB2301 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restructures the Hawaii Invasive Species Council as the Hawaii Invasive Species Authority, administratively attached to the Department of Agriculture, to coordinate implementation of the Hawaii Interagency Biosecurity Plan and to improve coordination of the State's invasive species prevention, early detection, rapid response, control, enforcement, and outreach programs. Appropriates funds to implement the Authority and relevant interagency invasive species projects. (HB2301 HD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species Program Administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 238-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-07-18 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2728 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.