HI HB2303 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows a definition of "related" to include relationships by blood, by marriage, legal guardians, and trustees of the foster adult. Legal guardians, trustees, and relatives may not continue to care for individuals with intellectual/developmental disabilities (I/DD) as a foster home; permits minors with I/DD to age in place under certain conditions; clarifies that certified adult foster homes with dual certification not exceed a total of three individuals with I/DD; and prohibits adult foster homes from dual certification.
Title
Developmental Disabilities Foster Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2853 (Same As) 2014-07-08 - Act 203, 7/2/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1313).