HI HB2325 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State and counties to approve, approve with modification, or disapprove all broadband related permits within forty-five business days. Provides that if no action is taken, the application will be deemed approved on the forty-sixth business day. Sunsets on June 30, 2017. (HB2325 HD2)
Title
Broadband Permits; Automatic Approval; Construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/CPN deferred the measure until 03-19-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to EDT/CPN, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 185). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cullen, Johanson, C. Lee, M. Lee, Rhoads, Takai, Wooley, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Pine, Riviere, Thielen voting no (6) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Manahan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 835-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Riviere; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Re-referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 24 | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Tokioka. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) on ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-12. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-07-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to ERB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |