HI HB234 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates standards and procedures for income-withholding for purposes of enforcing restitution orders. Extends victims' access to adult probation records for purposes of enforcing restitution orders. Applies bail court-ordered restitution case. Appropriation. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB234 HD1)
Title
Honolulu Prosecuting Attorney Package; Collection of Restitution ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-07 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Har. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |