HI HB2352 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Streamlines the process for completing the Department of Land and Natural Resources' required annual payment of debt service on the reimbursable general obligation bonds for Turtle Bay.
Title
Relating To The Payment Of Debt Service On The Turtle Bay Reimbursable General Obligation Bonds.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2908 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2352&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2352_.HTM |