HI HB2358 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from the definition of "public lands" lands set aside by the Governor to the Hawaii Public Housing Authority or lands to which the Hawaii Public Housing Authority, Department of Education, Hawaii State Public Library System, or Hawaii Health Systems Corporation holds title. Requires legislative approval of the sale or gift of lands set aside by the governor to the Hawaii Public Housing Authority or lands to which the Hawaii Public Housing Authority, Department of Education, Hawaii State Public Library System, or Hawaii Health Systems Corporation holds title. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Espero, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; L. Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 713) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3701) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3110) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-20-18 3:05PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 36). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 774-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 319-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, C. Lee, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki, Todd excused (2). |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2785 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM.
Subjects
DOE
Hawaii Public Housing Authority Lands Exemption
Hawaii State Public Library System
HHSC
Public Lands
Hawaii Public Housing Authority Lands Exemption
Hawaii State Public Library System
HHSC
Public Lands