HI HB238 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Act 195, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Act 195, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the per diem payments to $145 for out-of-state witnesses in criminal cases. Provides an additional $90 as a per diem payment for witnesses from any island other than the island on which the court is located, when that witness is required to stay overnight. (HB238 CD1)
Title
Honolulu Prosecutor Package; Witnesses in Criminal Cases; Per Diem Payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Act 195, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298). |
2014-07-03 | House | Act 195, on 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 116-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 116-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3390) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3051) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 196). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 154), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Wooley. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |