HI HB2381 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide a minimum amount of paid sick leave to employees to be used to care for themselves or a family member who is ill or needs medical care.
Title
Paid Sick Leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2493 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2381&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2381_.HTM |