HI HB2383 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 353E, Hawaii Revised Statutes (HRS), to reflect nationally recognized best practices in the statewide, integrated programming for sex offenders, and to identify the coordinating body for the sex offender treatment program as the "sex offender management team." Exempts the statewide integrated sex offender treatment program from the requirements of chapter 92, HRS.
Title
Statewide Integrated Sex Offender Treatment Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-01-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2912 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Act 036, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2383&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2383_.HTM |