HI HB2388 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies circumstances under which the Hawaii Paroling Authority may grant early discharges. Provides the paroling authority with discretion when considering pardons for paroled prisoners and clarifies early discharge consideration of paroled prisoners is an administrative action, not an in-person hearing before the authority.
Title
Relating To Parole.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2815 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2388&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2388_.HTM |