HI HB2394 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a refundable tax credit for purchase of respiratory equipment to protect against the effects of vog to persons whose primary care physician recommends that they create a "safe room" in their homes with the assistance of that respiratory equipment. Amends provisions of the Hawaii tobacco settlement special fund.
Title
Vog-related Respiratory Assistance Equipment; Refundable Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-09-10 9:30 am in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2394&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2394_.HTM |