HI HB2399 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 922).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 922).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Extended Producer Responsibility Program. Requires certain producers of fast-moving consumer goods to register with the Department of Health and pay an annual fee based on the amount of packaging volume the covered producer places on the market each calendar year. Provides for the deposit of fees into an Extended Producer Responsibility Special Fund. Provides for the expenditure of moneys from the Extended Producer Responsibility Special Fund for the creation of a report that assesses the resources needed to reduce the volume of packaging waste sent to landfills or power plants that burn municipal solid waste as a fuel by fifty per cent and eighty per cent by a date to be determined by rule. Appropriates moneys. Effective 7/1/2100. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Waste Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 922). |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Wakai, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Johanson, Marten Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 853) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3932) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-23-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 03-23-22 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/EET, WAM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH/AEN, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 215). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 550-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Morikawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Matayoshi. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:05AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3246 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HTH/AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Counties
Department of Health
Extended Producer Responsibility
Fast-Moving Consumer Goods
Packaging
Special Fund
Waste Reduction
Counties
Department of Health
Extended Producer Responsibility
Fast-Moving Consumer Goods
Packaging
Special Fund
Waste Reduction