HI HB2399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 165, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 165, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts an additional administrative assistant position in the Hawaii State Public Library System from civil service. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii State Public Library System.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Act 165, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2024-07-03 | House | Act 165, on 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 42-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 42-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Lamosao, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 9:35AM in conference room 309. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Hashimoto. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa Chair; Lamosao, Alcos. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3807) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-24 3:00PM; CR 229. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU/LBT, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 368). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson excused (5). |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3088 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to EDU/LBT, WAM.