HI HB2408 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to issue revocable permits without approval of the Board of Land and Natural Resources. Effective July 1, 2050. Repealed on July 1, 2021. (HB2408 HD2)
Title
Disposition of Land; Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 306). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Keohokalole, McKelvey, Morikawa, Pouha, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-12-16 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3). |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 55-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2937 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.