HI HB2412 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-29 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the legislative reference bureau to analyze and report on the environmental impacts on businesses and communities, as a result of the reduction in services for the department of agriculture's plant quarantine branch and commodities branch statewide.
Title
Legislative Reference Bureau; Department of Agriculture's Plant Quarantine Branch and Commodities Branch; Layoffs
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Hermina Morita [D] | Rep. Roland Sagum [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 1/29/10 9:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Referred to AGR, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2058 (Same As) 2010-01-20 - (S) Referred to WTL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2412&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2412_.HTM |