HI HB2415 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a court that convicts a person for driving a motor vehicle without the required insurance to suspend the person's driver's license and to impound the vehicle at the vehicle owner's expense.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-07-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2415&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2415_.HTM |