HI HB2451 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Johanson, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McKelvey, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, Eli, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan voting no (7) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Johanson, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McKelvey, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, Eli, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan voting no (7) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Explicitly recognizes advanced practice registered nurses as attending providers and consulting providers capable of performing all necessary duties under the Our Care, Our Choice Act in accordance with their scope of practice and prescribing authority. Reduces the mandatory waiting period between oral requests made by a terminally ill individual from twenty to fifteen days. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Johanson, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McKelvey, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, Eli, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan voting no (7) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Say, Yamane; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Har; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Cachola, Kong, Matsumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, McKelvey, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Har, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Quinlan, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3). |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 166-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-31-20 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |