HI HB248 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the acts of killing or inflicting serious or substantial bodily injury upon a pregnant woman in the course of committing or attempting to commit a felony, to the offenses for which a person is subject to an extended or mandatory minimum term of imprisonment.
Title
Sentences for Injuries to Pregnant Women; Extended and Mandatory Minimum Terms of Imprisonment
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-13. |
2013-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=248&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB248_.HTM |