HI HB2485 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 076, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Act 076, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals an obsolete fee for a certified copy of a tax clearance. Adds a penalty for failure to comply with reporting requirements under the general excise tax law and transient accommodations tax law for collection of rent by a third party. Raises the unfair competition penalty under the general excise tax law to adjust for inflation. (SD2)
Title
Relating To State Tax Administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Act 076, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2024-06-24 | House | Act 076, on 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782). |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771). |
2024-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 629) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye, Keohokalole, Kim, McKelvey, Richards, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3712) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Kidani. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-24 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3109) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-24 10:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 51). |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto, Poepoe. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Takayama excused (2). |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 288-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3174 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Collection of Rental Payments
General Excise Tax
Transient Accommodations Tax
Unfair Competition Penalty
General Excise Tax
Transient Accommodations Tax
Unfair Competition Penalty