HI HB2486 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Kapolei Jobs Initiative Program that offers tax incentives to increase the number of businesses willing to establish themselves or open a new location in the Kapolei region. Takes effect 2/19/2030. Repeals on 12/31/2021. (SD1)
Title
Kapolei Jobs Initiative; Qualified Business; Income Tax Credit; Unemployment Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3117) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Ihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDL/ WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 318). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950-16) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 480-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-16 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-16. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-05-16 9:01AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EDB, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |