HI HB2487 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide inter-county liquor commission working group for the purpose of creating standardized liquor regulation rules. Appropriation. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Liquor Commission ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-07 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |