HI HB2499 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "bicycle" for purposes of county vehicular taxes, highway safety laws, statewide traffic code, and bicycle laws by adding "low-speed electric bicycles" to the laws and defining low-speed electric bicycles. Excludes low-speed electric bicycles from the definitions of "moped", "motor vehicle", and "vehicle." Prohibits low-speed electric bicycle riding on all sidewalks. (HB2499 HD1)
Title
Relating To Low-speed Electric Bicycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 360-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |