HI HB2520 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the requirement for certain motion picture theater owners and operators to provide open movie captioning at least twice per week, one of which begins no earlier than 4:30 p.m. Repeals the requirement to provide an option of personal closed captioning screenings by means of lightweight eyewear.
Title
Relating To Movie Theaters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-02-18 8:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2650 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2520&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2520_.HTM |