HI HB2525 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires individual health insurance plans and small group plans to establish rates based upon community rating. Creates a temporary premium subsidy program to offset certain rate increases for qualified plans purchased through the Hawaii Health Connector. Effective 07/01/2112. (HD2)
Title
Health Insurance; Rates; Community Rating; Premiums
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-27-14 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-14 at 2:00PM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Thielen, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-14 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-14 at 11:30am. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14, 2:00PM. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 5:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14 at 8:30AM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 01-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-14 at 11:00am. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 01-29-14 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |