HI HB2525 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an incentive program for current educational assistants in hard-to-fill schools to attain teacher licensure if they commit to teaching for three years in a hard-to-fill school. Appropriates funds for the program and alternate teacher route contracts.
Title
Educational Assistant Certification Incentive Program; Alternate Teacher Route Contract; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2782 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2525&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2525_.HTM |