HI HB2525 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds knowingly making a false statement to a county inspector a crime within the offense of unsworn falsification to authorities.
Title
Relating To Offenses Against Public Administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2092 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2525&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2525_.HTM |