HI HB2533 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that persons or minors that enter private property with or without charge by a landowner for recreational purposes have no cause of action, unless exempted under law. Requires a court to award attorneys' fees and costs to landowners if plaintiffs bring unreasonable claims. Establishes as a matter of law, persons or minors participating in outdoor recreational activities accept the inherent dangers in the activities.
Title
Relating To Tort Liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2176 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - The recommendation was not adopted.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2533&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2533_.HTM |