HI HB2544 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizes Insurance Code.
Title
Insurance Producers; Adjusters; Independent Bill Reviewers; Managing General Agents; Bail Agents; Port-of-Entry Insurance; Captive Insurance; Mutual Benefit Societies; Health Maintenance Organizations; Access to Records; Confidentiality of Documents; Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 02-04-10 2:00 pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2697 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - (H) Act 116, on 5/18/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 331).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2544&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2544_.htm |