HI HB2549 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the language and meaning of any proposed constitutional amendment and ratification question to be as simple, concise, and direct as possible considering the complexity of the subject matter. Allows the presiding officers of the Legislature to request a written opinion of the Supreme Court regarding the legality of a proposed amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution and the corresponding constitutional ratification question. Requires the court to provide a written opinion within 14 days of receipt of the request. Prohibits any appeal of a written opinion. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Constitutional Amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3404) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 247). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Say, Tokioka voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2). |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |