HI HB2559 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 114, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 114, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the authority of a law enforcement officer to take into custody and transport a person subject to an assisted community treatment order to any designated mental health program. Requires a court order stating probable cause to believe a person is mentally ill or suffering from substance abuse, is imminently dangerous to self or others and in need of care or treatment, or both, to also direct the person to be taken into custody and, if subject to an assisted community treatment order, transported to any designated mental health program. Extends the maximum duration of assisted community treatment that may be ordered by the court to one year. Narrows the circumstances under which a subject of an assisted community treatment order may be physically forced to take medication to require the subject to be physically present in an emergency room or admitted to a hospital. Repeals the sunset date of the current statutory requirements for assisted community treatment. (HB2559 CD1)
Title
Mental Health; Assisted Community Treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act 114, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). |
2016-06-23 | House | Act 114, on 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 93-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 93-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, Cachola, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 3:15pm in conference room 016. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Kidani, Nishihara. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads, Cachola Co-Chairs; Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 623) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3499) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2980) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDL. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM/JDL. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 152). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 785-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2016-02-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 388-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-02-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-12-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-16 11:30AM. |
2016-02-04 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 10:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2982 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.