HI HB2564 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-18 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-18 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Board of Land and Natural Resources and Commission on Water Resource Management shall not conduct contested case hearings, and counties shall not conduct contested case hearings regarding disputes over land use, but that decisions and disputes may be contested and adjudicated in circuit court. Effective 7/1/2018.
Title
Relating To Government.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-18 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3020 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2564&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2564_.HTM |