HI HB2566 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the Hawaii Early Intervention Coordinating Council membership and functions to be consistent with part C of the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act of 2004 requirements regarding the state interagency coordinating council.
Title
Hawaii Early Intervention Coordinating Council
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2828 (Same As) 2012-04-30 - (S) Act 096, 4/30/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2566 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2566_.htm |