HI HB2605 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-26-18 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-26-18 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a transient accommodations broker to register as a tax collection agent for its operators and plan managers. Requires operators and plan managers to provide a statement to the transient accommodations broker confirming compliance with all applicable land use and tax laws. Requires the operator or plan manager to provide verification of compliance with state and county land use laws. Requires an operator or plan manager to remove a transient accommodation advertisement upon notice that the property is not in compliance with state law or county ordinance. Establishes a 1-time amnesty program for certain delinquent transient accommodations and general excise tax obligations. Authorizes counties to require the disgorgement of profits obtained through unlawful actions. Authorizes counties to adopt ordinances to amortize or phase out transient vacation rental units. Allocates up to $1,000,000 of TAT revenues to each county, contingent upon the county establishing a process to provide verification of compliance by an operator or plan manager with county land use laws. Makes it unlawful for transient accommodations brokers to engage in business with operators or plan managers or property managers or activity providers that are not in compliance with all state laws and county ordinances. Makes it unlawful for a hosting platform to provide, and collect a fee for, booking services regarding transient vacation rentals that are not lawfully certified, registered, or permitted under applicable county ordinance. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-26-18 11:30AM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 662). |
2018-04-23 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Hashimoto added as Conferee. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Nishihara, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, McDermott. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to TOU, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 752) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from ETT/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3182) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 1:45PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to ETT/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ing, Matsumoto, Quinlan, Say, Souki, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1132-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 696-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Fukumoto, Cachola, Ito, LoPresti, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2963 (Same As) 2018-03-01 - Re-referred to TOU, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Amnesty
Brokers
General Excise Tax ($)
Tax Collection Agents
Taxation
Transient Accommodations Tax
Vacation Rentals
Brokers
General Excise Tax ($)
Tax Collection Agents
Taxation
Transient Accommodations Tax
Vacation Rentals