HI HB2606 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Tropic Care program of the United States Department of Defense to provide free medical care to individuals in rural areas. (HB2606 HD1)
Title
Relating To Tropic Care.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 241). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-13-18 10:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-06 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2973 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to CPH, WAM.