HI HB2619 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Act 231, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Act 231, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to lead and coordinate the State's invasive pest control and eradication biosecurity efforts. Establishes certain reporting requirements. Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for programs and positions in agricultural biosecurity. Appropriates funds to each county as a grant-in-aid, subject to a county match, for the implementation of feral chicken control programs. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Biosecurity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Senate | Act 231, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336). |
2024-07-09 | House | Act 231, on 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336). |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. #1331), various appropriations throughout the bill. |
2024-07-08 | House | Vetoed on 07/08/24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331), line-item appropriations veto. |
2024-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 154-24). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 154-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Dela Cruz, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Yamashita, Aiu, Kahaloa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 5:00PM in conference room 309. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 4:45PM in conference room 309. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 11:05AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 780). |
2024-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Aiu, Kahaloa, Ward. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Richards. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 651) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3066) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 59). |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos. |
2024-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-14-24 9:15AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2419 (Same As) 2024-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4).