HI HB2623 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from the highway development special fund to conduct a feasibility study to implement an intelligent transportation system on the island of Maui.
Title
Transportation; Maui; Highway Development Special Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-08-10 9:00am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2623&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2623_.HTM |