HI HB2650 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an option on tax returns for a donation to the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts. (HB2650 HD1)
Title
Tax Return; Foundation on Culture and the Arts; General Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 4:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Re-referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from CUA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) The committees on CUA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-12 at 11:40 am in conference room 329. | |
2012-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 2/6/12. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CUA on Saturday, 02-04-12 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to CUA, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |