HI HB2650 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to develop a regularly updated, publicly accessible system that tracks appropriations made for contracts with provider agencies that offer services to homeless persons on behalf of the State and measures the effectiveness of services provided by these agencies. (HB2650 HD1)
Title
Relating To Homeless Services Providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 45). |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 343-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-09-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |